Temple, Michael John (CPSO#: 64990)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6039
Fax: (416) 813-2139
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN TEMPLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEMPLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Rotating - Incomplete Information

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993