Templeman, John Fredric (CPSO#: 54495)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 20 Oct 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Oct 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Oct 1995