Templeton, Christina Gordon (CPSO#: 71015)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 1997 to 07 Apr 1997
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Apr 2002