Tenaschuk, Danny Stephen (CPSO#: 52701)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4512
Fax: (613) 748-4921
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Tenaschuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tenaschuk ( CPSO# 52701 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANNY STEPHEN TENASCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TENASCHUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1985