Tenbergen, Melissa Marie (CPSO#: 98071)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
104-25 Elm St
St Thomas ON  N5R 1H5
Phone: 226-210-3773
Fax: 519-914-0122
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm St
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Canada
Phone: 519-631-2020
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Tenbergen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tenbergen ( CPSO# 98071 )

Business Address:
104 - 25 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 1H5

Business Address:
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA MARIE TENBERGEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TENBERGEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2014