Teng, Sophia C (CPSO#: 99799)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Jan 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9301 Bathurst Street, #8
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9S2
Phone: (905) 237-7472
Fax: (905) 237-2854
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

11211 Yonge Street, #C1
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0E9
Canada
Phone: (905) 884-4040
Fax: (905) 884-2755
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sophia Teng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Teng ( CPSO# 99799 )

Business Address:
Suite 8
9301 Bathurst Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9S2
Phone Number: (905) 237-7472

Business Address:
Suite C1
11211 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0E9
Phone Number: (905) 884-4040

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jan 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 09 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 09 Jan 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Sophia C Teng may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.