Tenn-Lyn, Nicole Andrea (CPSO#: 74908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2041
Fax: 905-883-2138
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicole A. Tenn-Lyn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Tenn-Lyn ( CPSO# 74908 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2041

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE ANDREA TENN-LYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TENN-LYN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005