Tennen, Jerry (CPSO#: 21992)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1022
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 922-7723
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JERRY TENNEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TENNEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2013
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2013
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Mar 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2016

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Nov 2013
Summary:

On November 18, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Jerry Tennen, a psychiatrist, 
has committed professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of 
the profession, and in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Tennen admitted the 
allegations.  
 
Dr. Tennen treated Patient A from 1997 to 1999. On occasion, he ended his therapy sessions with 
Patient A by placing his arm around her shoulder or giving her a hug. On one occasion when 
leaving his office, Dr. Tennen kissed Patient A on the lips. The College expert found that Dr. 
Tennen failed to maintain a proper frame for the psychotherapy treatment, displayed a deficiency 
in skill and judgment in the act of kissing the patient on the lips and that his record keeping was 
marginal and there was no diagnostic formulation noted. 
 
Dr. Tennen treated Patient B from 1997 to 2009. During their therapeutic relationship, Dr. 
Tennen exchanged brief hugs with Patient B, provided Patient B a kiss on the cheek, and while 
Patient B was in the midst of an eroticized transference, Dr. Tennen asked to see her surgical 
incision on her back. She lifted her shirt and he examined her scar. The College expert found that 
Dr. Tennen failed to maintain a proper frame for psychotherapy in light of the patient's eroticized 
transference, displayed a lack of skill and judgment in misjudging the impact of physical 
attention on this patient and in asking to see her surgical incision, and that his record keeping was 
marginal and there was no clear formulation of his patient. 
 
The Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
      the Registrar suspend Dr. Tennen's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) 
      months commencing at 12:01 a.m. on December 1, 2013. 
 
      the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Tennen's 
      certificate of registration: 
 
a)    Dr. Tennen shall, within 30 days from the date of this Order, retain a clinical supervisor, 
      approved by the College, who shall sign the Undertaking in the form attached hereto as 
      Schedule "A" (the "Clinical Supervisor"). Dr. Tennen shall meet with the Clinical 
      Supervisor every two weeks to review the cases and charts of a minimum of three female 
      patients with potential to experience, or actively, experiencing, transference in the course 
      of treatment. Dr. Tennen shall abide by all recommendations of his Clinical Supervisor. 
 
b)    following a twelve month period of supervision, Dr. Tennen shall undergo a reassessment 
      of his practice by a College appointed assessor who shall report the results of the 
      assessment to the College. 
 
c)    Dr. Tennen shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient 
      charts by College representatives for the purposes of monitoring and enforcing 
      compliance with the terms of this Order. 
d)    Dr. Tennen shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing the 
      terms of this Order. 
 
      Dr. Tennen attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
      Dr. Tennen pay costs to the College in the amount of $4,460.00 within thirty (30) days of 
      the date of this Order. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 18, 2013