Tennenhouse, Joel Edward (CPSO#: 55401)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St John's Hospital
800 East Carpenter
Springfield IL  62769
United States
Phone: (217) 544-6464 Ext. 45434

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL EDWARD TENNENHOUSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TENNENHOUSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1986