Tennent, Alison Catherine (CPSO#: 78395)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2002 to 07 Oct 2002
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Apr 2005