Tenore, Josie Leigh (CPSO#: 54120)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
595 Elm Place
Highland Park IL  60035
United States
Phone: 847-681-8821
Fax: 847-681-8922

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Nov 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSIE LEIGH TENORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TENORE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2014