Teo, Iris Yu Hung (CPSO#: 82624)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Anatomical Pathology
4th floor, Critical Care Wing
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 79043
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRIS YU HUNG TEO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2011