Teo, Su-Ting (CPSO#: 69979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber College
205 Humber College Blvd
Toronto ON  M9W5L7
Phone: (416) 675-6622 Ext. 4533
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SU-TING TEO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1999