Teodorini, Irving Kendall (CPSO#: 21146)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: P O Box 624 Fonthill, ON L0S 1E0
Date Received: 30 May 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014