Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Teoh, Tiong Ghee (CPSO#: 68416)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Jul 1996
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1996