Teper, Shane Hillel (CPSO#: 65095)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
Queen Square Doctors
366 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6V 1P8
Phone: (905) 455-1455
Fax: (905) 455-5498
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Teper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Teper ( CPSO# 65095 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6V 1P8
Phone Number: (905) 455-1455

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANE HILLEL TEPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEPER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993