Teplitsky, Yoella (CPSO#: 88648)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Anishnawbe Health Toronto
225 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1S4
Phone: (416) 360-0486
Fax: (416) 365-1083
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOELLA TEPLITSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEPLITSKY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010