Tepper, Jamie (CPSO#: 70231)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-3597
Fax: (905) 721-6658
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jamie Tepper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tepper ( CPSO# 70231 )

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-3597

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 02 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMIE TEPPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEPPER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Clinical Immunology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997