Tepper, Stephen Jay (CPSO#: 66881)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bridgepoint Hospital
1 Bridgepoint Dr
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone: (416) 461-8251 Ext. 1255
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Tepper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tepper ( CPSO# 66881 )

Business Address:
Bridgepoint Hospital
1 Bridgepoint Road
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8251

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN JAY TEPPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEPPER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995