Tepperman, Arnold David (CPSO#: 21988)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Feb 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services 111 St. Regent Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 416-398-0638
Date Received: 10 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Feb 2018