Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Terespolsky, Deborah (CPSO#: 62787)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LifeLabs Genetics
175 Galaxy Drive
Suite 105
Toronto ON  M9W 0C9
Phone: 1-844-363-4357
Fax: 647-943-2804
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

42 Prince Edward Blvd
Thornhill
Thornhill ON  L3T 7G1
Canada
Phone: (905) 881-9235
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wulffhart and Terespolsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Wulffhart ( CPSO# 62786 )
Dr. D. Terespolsky ( CPSO# 62787 )

Business Address:
Suite 602
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 953-7917

Business Address:
42 Prince Edward Boulevard
Markham ON  L3T 7G1

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6

Business Address:
175 Galaxy Boulevard
Suite 105
Toronto ON  M9W 0C9

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH TERESPOLSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TERESPOLSKY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1990