Terespolsky, Nachum (CPSO#: 88268)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The Hebrew University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 23 Jul 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 24 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008