Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Teron, Louisa Lea Crooks (CPSO#: 52952)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa,ON
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: 613 721-2000
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUISA LEA CROOKS TERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TERON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985