Terpstra, Collin Rudy (CPSO#: 86587)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
1730 Bishop Street North
Cambridge ON  N1T 1N4
Phone: (519) 578-1500
Fax: (519) 800-3732
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

25 Joseph Street
Kitchener ON  N2A 2T5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Collin Terpstra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Terpstra ( CPSO# 86587 )

Business Address:
Unit 1A
1730 Bishop Street North
Cambridge ON  N1T 1N4
Phone Number: (519) 578-1500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 20 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLLIN RUDY TERPSTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TERPSTRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2011