Tervo, Raymond Charles (CPSO#: 28096)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Nov 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Feb 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Nov 1987