Teschke, Susan Reilly (CPSO#: 90342)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone: (519) 804-9234
Fax: (519) 804-2602
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Centre for Family Medicine
10 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Canada
Phone: (519) 783-0020
Fax: (519) 783-0031
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN REILLY TESCHKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESCHKE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Apr 2009 to 06 May 2009
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

McMaster University, 24 Oct 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2013