Tesher, Martin Sheldon (CPSO#: 19227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1964

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1964

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9 East 68th Street
Suite 1C
New York NY  10065
United States
Phone: (212) 639-1800
Fax: (212) 639-9506

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN SHELDON TESHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESHER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1964

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Aug 2002
Summary:

 On August 12, 2002, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Tesher(s plea of guilty and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct in that the governing body of a health profession in a 
 jurisdiction other than Ontario has provided records to the College evidencing that an allegation 
 of professional misconduct or incompetence or a similar allegation has been made against Dr. 
 Tesher, and that he has entered into an agreement or compromise with the governing body in order 
 to settle the matter without a finding of misconduct or incompetence or a similar finding being 
 made which would, in the opinion of the College, be an act of professional misconduct as defined 
 in subsection (1), or would constitute incompetence as defined in section 52 of the Health 
 Professions Procedural Code; and he has committed an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.


1.	THE DISCIPLINE COMMITTEE DIRECTS the Registrar 
 to suspend Dr. Tesher(s 	certificate of registration for a period of three months, starting on a 
 date to be fixed by the 	Registrar after conferring with Dr. Tesher.

2.	The DISCIPLINE COMMITTEE 
 ORDERS the removal of three months of the suspension if Dr. Tesher provides confirmation to the 
 College that he has completed the courses that he was required to take in the United States and 
 those courses are satisfactory to the College. 

3.	THE DISCIPLINE COMMITTEE REQUIRES Dr. Tesher 
 to attend before this panel to be reprimanded.

4.	THE DISCIPLINE COMMITTEE REQUIRES Dr. Tesher to 
 pay part of the College(s costs to the College, fixed in the amount of $2,500.00, by August 30, 
 2002.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 12, 2002