Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Teshima, John Sakae (CPSO#: 68197)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
FG-62
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 3077
Fax: (416) 480-6818
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Temiskaming Hospital
421 Shepherdson Road
Box 4040
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Canada
Phone: (705) 647-1088
Fax: (705) 647-4154
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN SAKAE TESHIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESHIMA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999