Tesler, Janet (CPSO#: 81496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 700
200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge ON  L4L 9L3
Phone: (905) 856-2100
Fax: (905) 856-2101
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.C.S. Rucker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rucker ( CPSO# 76361 )
Dr. J. Tesler ( CPSO# 81496 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 19-104
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
3EN-462 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Kensington Eye Institute
Suite 600
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-2132

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET TESLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2007