Tessaro, Mark Oliver (CPSO#: 84569)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 4168137500
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Jul 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK OLIVER TESSARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESSARO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 25 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2009 to 25 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2014