Tessier, Alisha Kathleen (CPSO#: 91122)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: Mills, Alisha Kathleen (used until: 20 Dec 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 550 Byrne Road Yellowknife, NT X1A 2N1
Date Received: 04 Aug 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2015