Tessier, Carole Rolande Marie (CPSO#: 91478)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Programme psychiatrique francophone
du Nord de l'Ontario
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: 613-715-5829
Fax: 613-715-5839
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Services de Counselling de
Kapuskasing Hearst
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 1W6
Canada
Phone: 705-335-8468
Fax: 705-337-6008
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Mattawa Hospital
P.O. Box 70
Mattawa ON  P0H 1V0
Canada
Phone: 705-744-5511
Fax: 705-744-6020
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Hôpital de Témiscamingue-Kipawa
180, Anvik
Témiscamingue QC  J0Z 3R0
Canada
Phone: 819-627-3385
Fax: 819-627-9497
County: 
Electoral District: 

Pavillon Sainte-Famille
Hôpital de Ville-Marie
22 Notre-Dame Nord
Ville-Marie QC  J9V 1W8
Canada
Phone: 819-629-2420
Fax: 819-629-3069
County: 
Electoral District: 

West Nipissing Family Health Team
172 Ethel Street, Unit 4, Box E1
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 1V9
Canada
Phone: (705) 753-5775
Fax: 705-753-5788
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carole Tessier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tessier ( CPSO# 91478 )

Business Address:
West Nipissing Family Health Team
172 Ethel Street
Box E1
Suite 4
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 1V9
Phone Number: (705) 753-5775

Business Address:
West Nipissing General Hospital
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Phone Number: (705) 753-3110

Business Address:
Mattawa General Hospital
217 Turcotte Park Road
Mattawa ON  P0H 1V0
Phone Number: (705) 744-5511

Business Address:
CMHA New Liskeard
20 May Street South
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 647-4444

Business Address:
Hearst/Kapuskasing Counselling Services
29 Byng Avenue
Suite 1
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 1W6
Phone Number: (705) 335-8468

Business Address:
North Bay Jail
2550 Trout Lake Road
North Bay ON  P1B 7S7
Phone Number: (705) 472-8115

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mattawa General Hospital Mattawa
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLE ROLANDE MARIE TESSIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESSIER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 31 Dec 2011 to 30 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 31 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 31 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 29 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 2014