Tessier, Joseph Luc Pierre Francois (CPSO#: 51852)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Programme psychiatrique du nord de
l'Ontario
Suite 5457
1145 Carling avenue Ottawa
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 5829
Fax: (613) 715-5839
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.F. Tessier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tessier ( CPSO# 51852 )

Business Address:
1525 rue Annonciation nord
Riviere Rouge QC  J0T 1T0
Phone Number: (819) 275-2118

Business Address:
2561 Chemin de la Lievre Sud
Mont Laurier QC  J9L 3G3
Phone Number: (819) 623-1234

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Suite 5457
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH LUC PIERRE FRANCOIS TESSIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESSIER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1983