Tessier, Pierre Charles (CPSO#: 43942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Mar 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 6201
Fax: 6137484914
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Équipe de santé familiale
communautaire de l'Est d'Ottawa
1811 boul. St-Joseph,
Orleans, Ontario
Ottawa ON  K1E 3W6
Canada
Phone: (613) 590-0533
Fax: (613) 590-7351
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

5230 Mitch Owens Road
Manotick ON  K4M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (613) 692-2571
Fax: (613) 692-0271
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pierre C. Tessier Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tessier ( CPSO# 43942 )

Business Address:
Hopital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Chile

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIERRE CHARLES TESSIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESSIER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1991