Tetreault, Patrice (CPSO#: 75590)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Aug 2001 to 02 Sep 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2002