Tetro, Andrew Marc (CPSO#: 62176)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Pinnacle Orthopedic and Spine Specialists PLLC, 700 Michigan Avenue, Buffalo, NY 14203, USA
Date Received: 02 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2015