Tevaarwerk, Gerald John Martin (CPSO#: 23528)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, German

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003