Tewfik, Sherif (CPSO#: 64633)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fairview Mall
Suite 334
PO Box 239
1800 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 5A7
Phone: (416) 499-7337
Fax: (416) 499-7339
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
Leslie Site
Department of Psychiatry
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6655
Fax: (416) 756-6671
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sherif Tewfik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tewfik ( CPSO# 64633 )

Business Address:
Fairview Mall
Suite 334
1800 Sheppard Avenue East
P.O. Box 239
Toronto ON  M2J 5A7
Phone Number: (416) 499-7337

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
8th Floor - 4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6655

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERIF TEWFIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEWFIK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 13 Sep 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 13 Sep 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1998