Tey, Andy Sing Seng (CPSO#: 63402)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 1996

Summary

Former Name: Tey, Sing Seng (used until: 25 Aug 1999 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Malaya, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
48 Penwick Crescent
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5B4
Phone: (905) 508-4607
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andy Tey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tey ( CPSO# 63402 )

Business Address:
48 Penwick Crescent
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5B4
Phone Number: (905) 508-4607

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDY SING SENG TEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Feb 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1996