Thain, Andrew Peter (CPSO#: 109853)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sheffield, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C University Hospital
Department of Cardiology
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3671
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Nov 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Nov 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Sep 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Oct 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Andrew Peter Thain may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Cardiology, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr.
                        Thain  holds  an  academic  appointment  at  the  rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires seven  years  from
                  the date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr.  Thain no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr. Thain's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr.  Thain's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on November 1, 2017, and expires  on  June 30,
                  2020.  Upon renewal of Dr. Thain's academic appointment at the University
                  of  Western  Ontario,  the  expiry  date  can be extended, subject to the
                  limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.