Thakur, Sarvesh Smiley (CPSO#: 62348)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective: 05 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Apr 2005