Thanassoulis, George (CPSO#: 76374)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Sep 2011