Thapar, Natasha (CPSO#: 86301)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATASHA THAPAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THAPAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 29 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2010 to 29 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2011 to 29 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2013