Thapedi, Isaac Martin Rantswaki (CPSO#: 22707)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 05 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:Howard University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - Illinois

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2016