Tharmaratnam, Yashodhara (CPSO#: 71602)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Colombo, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2466 Eglinton Avenue East
Unit 3
Scarborough ON  M1K 5J8
Phone: (416) 266-7786
Fax: (416) 266-2256
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASHODHARA THARMARATNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THARMARATNAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2000