Tharson, Carolyn Cherubini (CPSO#: 78938)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
570 Lacolle Way
Ottawa ON  K4A 0N9
Phone: 613-830-8388 Ext. 322
Fax: 613-778-8655
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cedric Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Edwards ( CPSO# 71174 )
Dr. C. Tharson ( CPSO# 78938 )

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN CHERUBINI THARSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THARSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 14 Apr 2003 to 11 May 2003
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 May 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2006