Thassanapaff, Vatinee (CPSO#: 94847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Feb 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East Tower
2nd Floor
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-6166
Fax: (905) 721-6604
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Thassanapaff ( CPSO# 94847 )
Dr. D. Li ( CPSO# 85719 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Feb 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Aug 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Aug 2012 Active View Details [+]
             Dr. Vatinee Thassanapaff may practise medicine independently in Paediatrics,
                                                 only.