Thatte, Smita Vinay (CPSO#: 53792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:Nagpur University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6221
Fax: 613 761 3603
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Smita Thatte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Thatte ( CPSO# 53792 )

Business Address:
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SMITA VINAY THATTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THATTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 1989 to 31 Jan 1990
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1989