The, Bok Lan (CPSO#: 32626)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German, Indonesian

Education:Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 502
1110 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3J 2T2
Phone: (416) 630-3614
Fax: (416) 630-0377
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bok Lan The Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. B. The ( CPSO# 32626 )

Business Address:
502 - 1110 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3J 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 630-3614

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOK LAN THE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1981