Theal, Jeremy John Thomas (CPSO#: 73982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
North York Division
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 450-4849
Fax: (416) 352-1729
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Theal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lee ( CPSO# 76472 )
Dr. J. Theal ( CPSO# 73982 )

Business Address:
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 633-9420

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Suite 3SE-179
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 21 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY JOHN THOMAS THEAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THEAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006